MN HF3382 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-15 - House: HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-15 - House: HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public hearings and public access to juvenile records governing provisions modified, expungement authorized of certain juvenile records, and human services commissioner authorized to grant set of asides or variances for certain individuals disqualified from licensure because of an offense as a juvenile.
Title
Public hearings and public access to juvenile records governing provisions modified, expungement authorized of certain juvenile records, and human services commissioner authorized to grant set of asides or variances for certain individuals disqualified from licensure because of an offense as a juvenile.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-15 | House: HF indefinitely postponed | |
2010-04-15 | House: Bills not identical, R/S, SF subbed on Calendar for the Day | |
2010-04-13 | House: Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF2790 | |
2010-04-12 | House: House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day | |
2010-03-17 | House: Second reading | |
2010-03-17 | House: Committee report, to pass as amended | |
2010-03-10 | House: Division action, to pass as amended and return to Public Safety Policy and Oversight | |
2010-03-08 | House: Author added Kahn | |
2010-03-04 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety Policy and Oversight | |
2010-03-04 | House: Referred by Chair to Crime Victims/Criminal Records Division |