MN HF338 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Author added Lesch
Pending: House Property and Local Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Author added Lesch
Pending: House Property and Local Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Cities authorized to create land-value taxation districts.
Title
Cities authorized to create land-value taxation districts.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Davnie [D] | Rep. Steve Elkins [D] | Rep. John Lesch [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Author added Lesch |
2019-03-04 | House | Author added Elkins |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred by Chair to Property and Local Tax Division |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |