MN HF3290 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-24 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-24 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Commission of Deaf, DeafBlind, and Hard-of-Hearing modified.
Title
Commission of Deaf, DeafBlind, and Hard-of-Hearing modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Pugh [R] | Rep. Tim O'Driscoll [R] | Rep. Laurie Halverson [D] | Rep. Debra Kiel [R] |
Rep. Tama Theis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2018-04-24 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on Calendar for the Day |
2018-04-23 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, April 25, 2018 |
2018-04-23 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF2777 |
2018-03-26 | House | Second reading |
2018-03-26 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2018-03-22 | House | Author added Theis. |
2018-03-21 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Government Operations and Elections Policy |
2018-03-12 | House | Author added Kiel. |
2018-03-05 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF2777 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Secretary of State Chapter 121 05/08/18