MN SF2777 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Secretary of State Chapter 121 05/08/18
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Secretary of State Chapter 121 05/08/18
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Deaf, DeafBlind, and Hard-of-Hearing Minnesotans commission provisions modification
Title
Deaf, DeafBlind, and Hard-of-Hearing Minnesotans commission provisions modification
Sponsors
Sen. Torrey Westrom [R] | Sen. Michelle Fischbach [R] | Sen. Ann Rest [D] | Sen. Mark Koran [R] |
Sen. James Carlson [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - House - House: Passage (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | Secretary of State Chapter 121 05/08/18 | |
2018-05-10 | Governor's action Approval 05/08/18 | |
2018-05-08 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2018-05-08 | Governor approval | |
2018-05-04 | Presented to Governor | |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Returned from House |
2018-05-02 | House | Bill was passed vote: 124-0 |
2018-05-02 | House | Third reading |
2018-04-30 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, May 02, 2018 |
2018-04-24 | House | Second reading |
2018-04-24 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on Calendar for the Day |
2018-04-23 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF3290 |
2018-04-23 | House | Received from Senate |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 67-0 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Special Order |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Second reading |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3290 (Similar To) 2018-04-24 - HF indefinitely postponed