MN HF328 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-30 - Author added Gruenhagen.
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-30 - Author added Gruenhagen.
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Active trade or business income maximum rate of 7.85 percent provided.
Title
Active trade or business income maximum rate of 7.85 percent provided.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-30 | House | Author added Gruenhagen. |
2017-01-26 | House | Author added Hertaus. |
2017-01-19 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Same As/Similar To
SF523 (Similar To) 2017-02-02 - Referred to Taxes