MN HF3273 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-09 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-09 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Metropolitan Council governance modified, and Transportation Advisory Board eliminated.
Title
Metropolitan Council governance modified, and Transportation Advisory Board eliminated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-09 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2018-05-09 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2018-05-08 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF2809 |
2018-04-09 | House | Author added Dettmer. |
2018-04-09 | House | Second reading |
2018-04-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2018-03-28 | House | Motion prevailed |
2018-03-28 | House | Motion to re-refer State Government Finance |
2018-03-28 | House | Second reading |
2018-03-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2018-03-22 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Transportation Finance |
2018-03-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Government Operations and Elections Policy |
2018-03-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation and Regional Governance Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2809 (Similar To) 2018-05-30 - Governor veto