MN HF3267 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Author added Robbins
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Author added Robbins
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Legislative auditor directed to conduct Department of Human Services audit, report required, and money appropriated.
Title
Legislative auditor directed to conduct Department of Human Services audit, report required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Author added Robbins |
2020-02-20 | House | Author added Urdahl |
2020-02-17 | House | Authors added Anderson and O'Driscoll |
2020-02-13 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Finance Division |