MN HF3257 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-26 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-26 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Commerce Fraud Bureau authority to apply for or execute search warrants clarified.
Title
Commerce Fraud Bureau authority to apply for or execute search warrants clarified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2016-04-26 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2016-04-25 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF 2791 |
2016-04-07 | House | Second reading |
2016-04-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2016-03-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Regulatory Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF2791 (Similar To) 2016-05-20 - House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Sunday, May 22, 2016.