MN HF3256 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-24 - Author added Hollins
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-24 - Author added Hollins
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Legalizing Affordable Housing Act; local land use and building permit provision modified.
Title
Legalizing Affordable Housing Act; local land use and building permit provision modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | House | Author added Hollins |
2022-02-11 | House | Referred by Chair to Local Government Division |
2022-02-10 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance and Elections |
Same As/Similar To
SF3259 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Local Government Policy