MN HF3254 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Secretary of State Chapter 51
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Secretary of State Chapter 51
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibited contract terms regarding choice of venue clarified.
Title
Prohibited contract terms regarding choice of venue clarified.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - House: Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - House: Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Secretary of State Chapter 51 | |
2022-05-09 | Governor's action Approval | |
2022-05-09 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2022-05-09 | Governor approval | |
2022-05-05 | Presented to Governor | |
2022-05-03 | House | Returned from Senate |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Special Order |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Second reading |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2022-03-29 | Senate | General Orders: Stricken and re-referred to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Second reading |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF2991 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF2991, now on General Orders |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Received from House |
2022-03-21 | House | Bill was passed |
2022-03-21 | House | Third reading |
2022-03-17 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, March 21, 2022 |
2022-03-10 | House | Second reading |
2022-03-10 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2022-02-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
2022-02-10 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2991 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF3254