MN HF325 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-03 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-03 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Political subdivision compensation limit repealed, and conforming change made.
Title
Political subdivision compensation limit repealed, and conforming change made.
Sponsors
Rep. Sandra Masin [D] | Rep. Cheryl Youakim [D] | Rep. Steve Elkins [D] | Rep. John Huot [D] |
Rep. Ginny Klevorn [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | House | Second reading |
2022-02-03 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2021-02-25 | House | Author added Klevorn |
2021-02-25 | House | Second reading |
2021-02-25 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2021-02-17 | House | Division action, return to State Government Finance and Elections |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred by Chair to Local Government Division |
2021-02-01 | House | Authors added Elkins and Huot |
2021-01-28 | House | Author added Youakim |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance and Elections |
Same As/Similar To
SF33 (Similar To) 2021-01-21 - Author added Bigham