MN HF3249 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-22 - Secretary of State Chapter 83
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-22 - Secretary of State Chapter 83
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Secretary of state governing or administrative provisions modified.
Title
Secretary of state governing or administrative provisions modified.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-20 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - House: Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - House: Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-22 | Secretary of State Chapter 83 | |
2022-05-22 | Governor's action Approval | |
2022-05-22 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2022-05-22 | Governor approval | |
2022-05-21 | Presented to Governor | |
2022-05-20 | House | Returned from Senate |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Special Order |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Second reading |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Received from House |
2022-03-14 | House | Bill was passed |
2022-03-14 | House | Third reading |
2022-03-10 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, March 14, 2022 |
2022-03-03 | House | Second reading |
2022-03-03 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2022-02-14 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
2022-02-10 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance and Elections |
Same As/Similar To
SF3087 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Referred to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy