MN HF3246 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-26 - Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-26 - Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Task force on childhood trauma-informed policy and practices established, and report required.
Title
Task force on childhood trauma-informed policy and practices established, and report required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2018-04-26 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance |
2018-04-25 | House | Author added Pugh. |
2018-03-26 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Government Operations and Elections Policy |
2018-03-19 | House | Author added Flanagan. |
2018-03-15 | House | Authors added Kresha and Albright. |
2018-03-12 | House | Author added Bly. |
2018-03-08 | House | Author added Slocum. |
2018-03-05 | House | Authors added Lee and Thissen. |
2018-03-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF3388 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy