MN HF3236 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Author added Christensen
Pending: House Energy and Climate Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Author added Christensen
Pending: House Energy and Climate Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Nursing home energy efficiency grant program established, and money appropriated.
Title
Nursing home energy efficiency grant program established, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Lippert [D] | Rep. Debra Kiel [R] | Rep. Zack Stephenson [D] | Rep. Tama Theis [R] |
Rep. Jennifer Schultz [D] | Rep. Rena Moran [D] | Rep. Mohamud Noor [D] | Rep. Shelly Christensen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Author added Christensen |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Energy and Climate Finance and Policy Division |
2020-03-02 | House | Author added Noor |
2020-02-13 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Long-Term Care Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF3123 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Energy and Utilities Finance and Policy