MN HF3195 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-28 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-28 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Educational data designation as public directory information limited, and private education data sharing with government entities with legitimate educational interest in data allowed.
Title
Educational data designation as public directory information limited, and private education data sharing with government entities with legitimate educational interest in data allowed.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-28 | House | Second reading |
2022-02-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2022-02-15 | House | Authors added Huot and Hanson, J. |
2022-02-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
Same As/Similar To
SF4122 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Referred to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy