MN HF3173 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-30 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-30 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Child care agencies; county agencies required to publish and distribute information about variances.
Title
Child care agencies; county agencies required to publish and distribute information about variances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-30 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2020-04-30 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2020-04-28 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF3197 |
2020-03-09 | House | Second reading |
2020-03-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Early Childhood Finance and Policy Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF3197 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Second reading