MN HF3167 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 308
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 308
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Omnibus supplemental tax bill.
Title
Omnibus supplemental tax bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-16 - House - House: Repassage, as amended by Conference (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-04 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 125 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-04 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 77 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-04 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 101 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-04 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 60 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-04 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 57 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-04 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 58 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-04 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 57 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-04 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 58 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-04 - House - House: Amendment to Loon Amendment (Y: 53 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-04 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 51 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-04 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 68 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-04 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 54 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-04 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 125 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-04 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 77 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-04 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 101 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-04 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 60 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-04 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 57 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-04 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 58 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-04 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 57 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-04 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 58 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-04 - House - House: Amendment to Loon Amendment (Y: 53 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-04 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 51 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-04 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 68 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-04 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 54 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-20 | Secretary of State Chapter 308 | |
2014-05-20 | Governor's action Approval | |
2014-05-20 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2014-05-17 | Presented to Governor | |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Third reading vote: 59-1 |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2014-05-16 | Senate | House adopted HCC report and repassed bill |
2014-05-16 | House | Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed vote: 59-1 |
2014-05-16 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference vote: 131-0 |
2014-05-16 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2014-05-16 | House | House adopted conference committee report |
2014-05-16 | House | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2014-05-09 | House | Author added Poppe |
2014-04-22 | House | Senate conferees Skoe, Rest, Dziedzic, Koenen, Gazelka |
2014-04-22 | House | Senate accedes, conference committee of 5 be appointed |
2014-04-10 | House | House conferees Lenczewski, Davnie, Davids, Torkelson, Slocum |
2014-04-10 | House | House refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2014-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate conferees Skoe; Rest; Dziedzic; Koenen; Gazelka |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate accedes, CC of 5 be appointed |
2014-04-10 | Senate | House conferees Lenczewski, Davnie, Davids, Torkelson, Slocum |
2014-04-10 | Senate | House not concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 57-6 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Second reading |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Comm report: No recommendation, re-referred to Taxes |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Received from House |
2014-04-04 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 125-0 |
2014-04-04 | House | Third reading as amended |
2014-04-04 | House | Amended |
2014-04-03 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, April 4, 2014 |
2014-04-02 | House | Author added Davids |
2014-04-02 | House | Second reading |
2014-04-02 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2014-03-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2014-03-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |