MN HF3159 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Author added Loeffler.
Pending: House Education Innovation Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Author added Loeffler.
Pending: House Education Innovation Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
School districts authorized to renew expiring referendums and capital project referendums by action of school board.
Title
School districts authorized to renew expiring referendums and capital project referendums by action of school board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Author added Loeffler. |
2018-03-05 | House | Author added Becker-Finn. |
2018-03-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Innovation Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2608 (Similar To) 2018-02-26 - Author added Rest