MN HF3131 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-24 - Author added Schultz.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-24 - Author added Schultz.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Flame-retardant chemical use in products prohibited.
Title
Flame-retardant chemical use in products prohibited.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Howe [R] | Sen. Jason Isaacson [D] | Rep. Cheryl Youakim [D] | Rep. Connie Bernardy [D] |
Rep. Peter Fischer [D] | Rep. Jennifer Schultz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | House | Author added Schultz. |
2016-03-21 | House | Author added Fischer. |
2016-03-17 | House | Authors added Youakim and Bernardy. |
2016-03-16 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF2330 (Similar To) 2016-05-09 - Senate file first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform