MN HF3100 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-17 - Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-17 - Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Insulin; dependent child notice required, Alec Smith Insulin Affordability Act established, reports required, public awareness campaign required, and money appropriated.
Title
Insulin; dependent child notice required, Alec Smith Insulin Affordability Act established, reports required, public awareness campaign required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-14 - House - House: H.F. NO. 3100 (Y: 111 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Passage (Y: 75 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Schomacker - Amendment - H3100A18 (Y: 53 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-26 - House - House: APPEAL RULING OF THE SPEAKER (Y: 72 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Passage (Y: 75 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Schomacker - Amendment - H3100A18 (Y: 53 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-26 - House - House: APPEAL RULING OF THE SPEAKER (Y: 72 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-17 | House | Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed |
2020-04-16 | Secretary of State Chapter 73 04/15/2020 | |
2020-04-15 | Governor's action Approval | |
2020-04-15 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2020-04-15 | Governor approval | |
2020-04-14 | Presented to Governor | |
2020-04-14 | Senate | Third reading |
2020-04-14 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2020-04-14 | Senate | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2020-04-14 | Senate | House adopted HCC report and repassed bill |
2020-04-14 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference |
2020-04-14 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2020-04-14 | House | House adopted conference committee report |
2020-04-14 | House | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Senate conferees Jensen; Benson; Pratt; Rosen; Wiklund |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Senate accedes, CC of 5 be appointed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | House conferees Howard; Liebling; Morrison; Albright; Neu |
2020-03-16 | Senate | House not concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2020-03-16 | House | Senate accedes, conference committee of 5 be appointed Jensen, Benson, Pratt, Rosen, Wiklund |
2020-03-16 | House | House conferees Howard, Liebling, Morrison, Albright, and Neu |
2020-03-12 | House | House refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2020-03-12 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Second reading |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Withdrawn |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Received from House |
2020-02-26 | House | Bill was passed |
2020-02-26 | House | Motion did not prevail |
2020-02-26 | House | Motion to re-refer Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2020-02-26 | House | Third reading |
2020-02-26 | House | Point of order raised, ruled well taken |
2020-02-26 | House | Amendments offered |
2020-02-24 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, February 26, 2020 |
2020-02-20 | House | Second reading |
2020-02-20 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2020-02-19 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2020-02-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2020-02-17 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance Division |
2020-02-13 | House | Authors added Youakim, Sauke, Schultz, Becker-Finn, Gomez, Hassan, Sandstede, Brand, Her, Sundin, Morrison, and Bierman |
2020-02-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Policy |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce |
Same As/Similar To
SF3164 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - HF passed, no substitution HF3100