MN HF31 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-21 - Authors added Carlson and Pryor
Pending: House Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-21 - Authors added Carlson and Pryor
Pending: House Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Telework activity funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Telework activity funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Elkins [D] | Rep. Frank Hornstein [D] | Rep. Patty Acomb [D] | Rep. Michael Howard [D] |
Rep. Heather Edelson [D] | Rep. Carlie Kotyza-Witthuhn [D] | Rep. Andrew Carlson [D] | Rep. Laurie Pryor [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-21 | House | Authors added Carlson and Pryor |
2021-01-19 | House | Authors added Howard, Edelson, and Kotyza-Witthuhn |
2021-01-14 | House | Authors added Hornstein and Acomb |
2021-01-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF94 (Similar To) 2021-01-19 - Authors added Dibble; Cwodzinski; Wiklund