MN HF3070 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-19 - Authors added Nash, O'Neill, and Lucero
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-19 - Authors added Nash, O'Neill, and Lucero
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Human trafficking offense penalties increased, and prostitution patron penalties increased.
Title
Human trafficking offense penalties increased, and prostitution patron penalties increased.
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Pinto [D] | Rep. Tim Miller [R] | Rep. Kelly Moller [D] | Rep. Jim Nash [R] |
Rep. Marion O'Neill [R] | Sen. Eric Lucero [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | House | Authors added Nash, O'Neill, and Lucero |
2020-02-17 | House | Author added Moller |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF4081 (Similar To) 2020-04-07 - Author added Relph