MN HF3067 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-19 - Authors added Long and Lillie
Pending: House Corrections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-19 - Authors added Long and Lillie
Pending: House Corrections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Private correctional facility moratorium established.
Title
Private correctional facility moratorium established.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | House | Authors added Long and Lillie |
2020-02-13 | House | Authors added Klevorn, Noor, and Hornstein |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Corrections Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF3384 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy