MN HF3038 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-21 - Authors added Ward, Kelly, and Johnson, C.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-21 - Authors added Ward, Kelly, and Johnson, C.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Minnesota Athletics Trainers Act modified.
Title
Minnesota Athletics Trainers Act modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Franson [R] | Rep. Tony Albright [R] | Rep. Mike Freiberg [D] | Rep. Joe Atkins [D] |
Sen. Jason Isaacson [D] | Rep. JoAnn Ward [D] | Rep. Tim Kelly [R] | Rep. Clark Johnson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-21 | House | Authors added Ward, Kelly, and Johnson, C. |
2016-03-17 | House | Authors added Atkins and Isaacson. |
2016-03-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF2609 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Author added Reinert