MN HF3038 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-05 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-05 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Connector highway length limit removed, trunk highway contracts one-week bid advertisement period allowed, and state responsibility for bond payments to cities with population decline clarified.
Title
Connector highway length limit removed, trunk highway contracts one-week bid advertisement period allowed, and state responsibility for bond payments to cities with population decline clarified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2014-05-05 | House | Bills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on General Register |
2014-05-02 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF2614 |
2014-03-27 | House | Second reading |
2014-03-27 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2014-03-13 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Policy |