MN HF3033 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Authors added Lillie and Johnson, S.
Pending: House Commerce and Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Internet service providers serving Minnesota customers and those under contract to the state or political subdivisions prohibited from certain activities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Internet service providers serving Minnesota customers and those under contract to the state or political subdivisions prohibited from certain activities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08HouseAuthors added Lillie and Johnson, S.
2018-03-05HouseAuthor added Youakim.
2018-03-01HouseAuthors added Halverson, Applebaum, Bly, and Wagenius.
2018-02-26HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Regulatory Reform

Same As/Similar To

SF2880 (Similar To) 2018-03-21 - Author added Hawj

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback