MN SF2880 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Author added Hawj
Pending: Senate Energy and Utilities Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Internet service contracts regulation; net neutrality adherence

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Internet service contracts regulation; net neutrality adherence

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21SenateAuthor added Hawj
2018-03-12SenateAuthor added Wiklund
2018-03-05SenateAuthor added Newton
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Energy and Utilities Finance and Policy
2018-03-01SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF3033 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Authors added Lillie and Johnson, S.

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback