MN HF302 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-19 - Author added Franke
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-19 - Author added Franke
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Police officer assault penalty enhanced, and law enforcement official personal information dissemination criminalized.
Title
Police officer assault penalty enhanced, and law enforcement official personal information dissemination criminalized.
Sponsors
Rep. Kurt Daudt [R] | Rep. Brian Daniels [R] | Rep. Dale Lueck [R] | Rep. Paul H. Anderson [R] |
Rep. Susan Akland [R] | Rep. Greg Boe [R] | Rep. Kristin Robbins [R] | Rep. Keith Franke [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | Author added Franke |
2022-04-08 | House | Authors added Anderson, Akland, Boe, and Robbins |
2022-02-01 | House | Author added Lueck |
2021-01-28 | House | Author added Daniels |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy |