MN HF3017 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Author added Robbins
Pending: House Commerce Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Author added Robbins
Pending: House Commerce Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Brewer off-sale liquor license condition modified.
Title
Brewer off-sale liquor license condition modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Nash [R] | Rep. Greg Boe [R] | Rep. Kristin Robbins [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | House | Author added Robbins |
2022-02-07 | House | Author added Boe |
2022-02-03 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3246 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy