MN HF3017 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-16 - Author added Christensen.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-16 - Author added Christensen.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Sexual assault examination kit procedure established, and notice provided to victims.
Title
Sexual assault examination kit procedure established, and notice provided to victims.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-16 | House | Author added Christensen. |
2018-05-07 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2018-05-07 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2018-05-03 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF2863 |
2018-03-29 | House | Author added Hornstein. |
2018-03-28 | House | Author added Jessup. |
2018-03-21 | House | Second reading |
2018-03-21 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2018-03-15 | House | Author added Hamilton. |
2018-03-14 | House | Author added Pugh. |
2018-03-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Reform |
2018-03-08 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy |
2018-03-05 | House | Author added Youakim. |
2018-03-01 | House | Author added Becker-Finn and Lillie. |
2018-02-26 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF2863 (Similar To) 2018-05-19 - Secretary of State, Filed