MN HF2980 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-03 - Author added Kunesh-Podein.
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-03 - Author added Kunesh-Podein.
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
St. Paul; Minnesota Humanities Center funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Title
St. Paul; Minnesota Humanities Center funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Mahoney [D] | Rep. Alice Hausman [D] | Rep. Bob Gunther [R] | Rep. Sheldon Johnson [D] |
Rep. Carlos Mariani [D] | Rep. Leon Lillie [D] | Sen. Mary Kunesh-Podein [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | House | Author added Kunesh-Podein. |
2018-03-05 | House | Author added Lillie. |
2018-02-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF2732 (Similar To) 2018-02-26 - Referred to Capital Investment