MN HF2968 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-08 - House: Author added Reinert
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-08 - House: Author added Reinert
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Environmentally sensitive cleaning products required to be used in public buildings, and guidelines and a task force established.
Title
Environmentally sensitive cleaning products required to be used in public buildings, and guidelines and a task force established.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | House: Author added Reinert | |
2010-03-04 | House: Authors added Clark and Greiling | |
2010-02-18 | House: Authors added Persell and Ruud | |
2010-02-16 | House: Author added Slocum | |
2010-02-15 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment Policy and Oversight |
Minnesota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/revisor/pages/search_status/status_detail.php?b=House&f=HF2968&ssn=0&y=2009 |
Text | http://wdoc.house.leg.state.mn.us/leg/LS86/HF2968.0.pdf |