MN HF2967 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 24-2)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-07 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-07 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Collection of information on the connection between pornography and sex trafficking required, and authorized penalty assessment expanded to include additional crimes.
Title
Collection of information on the connection between pornography and sex trafficking required, and authorized penalty assessment expanded to include additional crimes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-07 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2018-05-07 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2018-05-03 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF2554 |
2018-04-30 | House | Author added Peterson. |
2018-04-09 | House | Author added Wills. |
2018-03-29 | House | Authors added Kiel, Lueck, and Jessup. |
2018-03-28 | House | Authors added Theis and Neu. |
2018-03-28 | House | Second reading |
2018-03-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2018-03-26 | House | Author added Ward |
2018-03-19 | House | Authors added Scott, Bennett, and Backer. |
2018-03-14 | House | Author added Koznick. |
2018-03-12 | House | Author added Heintzeman. |
2018-03-12 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2018-03-08 | House | Authors added Dettmer; Bahr, C.; and Pugh. |
2018-03-05 | House | Author added Drazkowski. |
2018-03-01 | House | Authors added Gruenhagen and Miller. |
2018-02-26 | House | Author added Knoblach. |
2018-02-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF2554 (Similar To) 2018-05-19 - Secretary of State Chapter 144 05/17/18