MN SF2554 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-19 - Secretary of State Chapter 144 05/17/18
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-19 - Secretary of State Chapter 144 05/17/18
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Information on the connection between pornography and sex trafficking collection requirement; authorized penalty assessment expansion
Title
Information on the connection between pornography and sex trafficking collection requirement; authorized penalty assessment expansion
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Benson [R] | Sen. Warren Limmer [R] | Sen. John Hoffman [D] | Sen. Jim Abeler [R] |
Sen. Paul Gazelka [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - House - House: Passage (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-19 | Secretary of State Chapter 144 05/17/18 | |
2018-05-19 | Governor's action Approval 05/17/18 | |
2018-05-17 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2018-05-17 | Governor approval | |
2018-05-14 | Presented to Governor | |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Returned from House |
2018-05-10 | House | Bill was passed vote: 127-0 |
2018-05-10 | House | Third reading |
2018-05-08 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-07 | House | Second reading |
2018-05-07 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2018-05-03 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF2967 |
2018-05-03 | House | Received from Senate |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 67-0 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Second reading |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2018-03-21 | Senate | General Orders: Stricken and re-referred to Finance |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Second reading |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2967 (Similar To) 2018-05-07 - HF indefinitely postponed