MN HF2950 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - Authors added Edelson and Moller
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - Authors added Edelson and Moller
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Educator support, crisis online learning, and short-call substitute teacher pilot provided.
Title
Educator support, crisis online learning, and short-call substitute teacher pilot provided.
Sponsors
Rep. Hodan Hassan [D] | Rep. Samantha Vang [D] | Rep. Cheryl Youakim [D] | Rep. Heather Keeler [D] |
Rep. Heather Edelson [D] | Rep. Kelly Moller [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | House | Authors added Edelson and Moller |
2022-02-10 | House | Second reading |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2022-02-07 | House | Author added Keeler |
2022-02-03 | House | Authors added Vang and Youakim |
2022-02-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |