MN HF2920 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-18 - Author added Edelson
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-18 - Author added Edelson
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
School board members employed by a school district maximum earnings increased.
Title
School board members employed by a school district maximum earnings increased.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-18 | House | Author added Edelson |
2022-05-17 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2022-05-17 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2022-05-16 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF3107 |
2022-03-14 | House | Second reading |
2022-03-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2022-01-31 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3107 (Similar To) 2022-05-22 - Secretary of State, Filed