MN HF2918 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-06 - Secretary of State, Filed April 1, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-06 - Secretary of State, Filed April 1, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Beverage production in basements authorized, and commissioner of agriculture directed to amend Minnesota Rules.
Title
Beverage production in basements authorized, and commissioner of agriculture directed to amend Minnesota Rules.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-06 | Secretary of State, Filed April 1, 2010 | |
2010-04-06 | Governor approval April 1, 2010 | |
2010-04-06 | Secretary of State Chapter 209 04/01/10 | |
2010-04-01 | Governor's action Approval | |
2010-03-29 | House: Returned from Senate | |
2010-03-29 | Senate: Calendar: Third reading Passed | |
2010-03-29 | Presentment date | |
2010-03-29 | Presented to Governor | |
2010-03-23 | Senate: General Orders: To pass | |
2010-03-18 | Senate: Second reading | |
2010-03-18 | Senate: Comm report: To pass | |
2010-03-09 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2010-03-09 | Senate: Received from House | |
2010-03-09 | Senate: Referred to State and Local Government Operations and Oversight | |
2010-03-08 | House: Author added Sterner | |
2010-03-08 | House: Bill was passed | |
2010-03-08 | House: Third reading | |
2010-03-08 | House: Amendments offered | |
2010-03-04 | House: House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day | |
2010-02-25 | House: Second reading | |
2010-02-25 | House: Committee report, to pass | |
2010-02-16 | House: Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Agriculture, Rural Economies and Veterans Affairs | |
2010-02-12 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Labor |