MN HF2899 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-7)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Secretary of State Chapter 297 05/10/10
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-7)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Secretary of State Chapter 297 05/10/10
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Administrative remedy provided for certain data practice law violations, data sharing agreement provided with the department of education, civil penalty provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Administrative remedy provided for certain data practice law violations, data sharing agreement provided with the department of education, civil penalty provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-11 | Secretary of State Chapter 297 05/10/10 | |
2010-05-10 | Governor approval | |
2010-05-10 | Governor's action Approval | |
2010-05-06 | Presentment date | |
2010-05-06 | Presented to Governor | |
2010-05-04 | House: Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate | |
2010-05-04 | House: Third reading as amended by the Senate | |
2010-05-04 | House: Motion prevailed | |
2010-05-04 | House: Motion to concur with Senate amendments | |
2010-05-04 | House: Returned from Senate with amendment | |
2010-05-04 | Senate: House concurred and repassed bill | |
2010-04-28 | Senate: Calendar: Third reading Passed | |
2010-04-26 | Senate: General Orders: To pass as amended | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Second reading | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Comm report: To pass as amended | |
2010-04-12 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2010-04-12 | Senate: Received from House | |
2010-04-12 | House: Author added Peterson | |
2010-04-12 | Senate: Referred to Finance | |
2010-04-08 | House: Bill was passed as amended | |
2010-04-08 | House: Third reading as amended | |
2010-04-08 | House: Amended | |
2010-04-07 | House: House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day | |
2010-03-25 | House: Second reading | |
2010-03-25 | House: Committee report, to pass | |
2010-03-23 | House: Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means | |
2010-03-16 | House: Division action, to pass as amended and return to Finance | |
2010-03-15 | House: Motion prevailed | |
2010-03-15 | House: Motion to re-refer Finance | |
2010-03-15 | House: Second reading | |
2010-03-15 | House: Committee report, to pass as amended | |
2010-03-15 | House: Referred by Chair to State Government Finance Division | |
2010-03-04 | House: Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Civil Justice | |
2010-03-01 | House: Author stricken Sterner | |
2010-02-25 | House: Author added Gottwalt | |
2010-02-18 | House: Author added Jackson | |
2010-02-11 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to State and Local Government Operations Reform, Technology and Elections |