MN HF289 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-02 - Author added Pérez-Vega
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-02 - Author added Pérez-Vega
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Grant program modified to support pregnant people in carrying their pregnancies to term and new parents caring for babies after birth.
Title
Grant program modified to support pregnant people in carrying their pregnancies to term and new parents caring for babies after birth.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-02 | House | Author added Pérez-Vega |
2023-03-01 | House | Author added Hollins |
2023-02-27 | House | Author added Feist |
2023-01-23 | House | Author added Freiberg |
2023-01-19 | House | Author added Youakim |
2023-01-17 | House | Authors added Tabke and Hemmingsen-Jaeger |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF336 (Similar To) 2023-01-25 - Author added Boldon