MN HF2869 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-21 - Author added Slocum
Pending: House Commerce and Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-21 - Author added Slocum
Pending: House Commerce and Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Crystal Sugar Cooperative or its subsidiaries; state purchasing prohibited until a certain date.
Title
Crystal Sugar Cooperative or its subsidiaries; state purchasing prohibited until a certain date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-21 | House | Author added Slocum |
2012-03-19 | House | Authors added Persell; Murphy, M.; Hilty |
2012-03-15 | House | Author added Winkler |
2012-03-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Regulatory Reform |
Minnesota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=House&f=HF2869&ssn=0&y=2011 |
Text | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/bin/getbill.php?number=HF2869&version=0&session=ls87 |