MN HF2867 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-24 - Author added Edelson
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-24 - Author added Edelson
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Soft body armor reimbursement grant eligibility expanded.
Title
Soft body armor reimbursement grant eligibility expanded.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | House | Author added Edelson |
2022-02-21 | House | Author added Klevorn |
2022-02-03 | House | Author added Urdahl |
2022-01-31 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2851 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Author added Newton