MN HF2859 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-25 - Governor's action Approval
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-25 - Governor's action Approval
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Nursing facility rate provisions modified.
Title
Nursing facility rate provisions modified.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Abeler [R] | Rep. Frank Hornstein [D] | Rep. Steve Simon [D] | Rep. Paul Thissen [D] |
Rep. Ryan Winkler [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-25 | Governor's action Approval | |
2010-05-18 | Presentment date | |
2010-05-16 | House: Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed | |
2010-05-16 | House: Bill was repassed as amended by Conference | |
2010-05-16 | House: Third reading as amended by Conference | |
2010-05-16 | House: Conference committee report | |
2010-05-16 | House: House adopted conference committee report | |
2010-05-16 | Senate: Conference committee report | |
2010-05-16 | Senate: Third reading | |
2010-05-16 | Senate: House adopted HCC report and repassed bill | |
2010-05-16 | Senate: Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill | |
2010-05-15 | House: House conferees Simon, Kalin, Gottwalt | |
2010-05-15 | House: House refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested | |
2010-05-15 | House: Returned from Senate with amendment | |
2010-05-15 | Senate: Senate conferees Cohen; Pappas; Latz | |
2010-05-15 | Senate: House not concur, conference committee of 3 requested | |
2010-05-15 | Senate: Senate accedes, CC of 3 be appointed | |
2010-05-15 | Senate: House conferees Simon; Kalin; Gottwalt | |
2010-05-15 | House: Senate conferees Cohen, Pappas, Latz | |
2010-05-15 | House: Senate accedes, conference committee of 3 be appointed | |
2010-05-14 | Senate: Third reading | |
2010-05-14 | Senate: Special Order: Amended | |
2010-05-12 | Senate: Second reading | |
2010-05-12 | Senate: Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF2567 | |
2010-05-11 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2010-05-11 | Senate: Received from House | |
2010-05-11 | Senate: Referred to Rules and Administration | |
2010-05-10 | House: Bill was passed | |
2010-05-10 | House: Third reading | |
2010-05-05 | House: House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day | |
2010-03-04 | House: Second reading | |
2010-03-04 | House: Committee report, to pass as amended | |
2010-02-18 | House: Division action, to pass as amended and return to Finance | |
2010-02-11 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to Finance | |
2010-02-11 | House: Referred by Chair to Health Care and Human Services Finance Division |