MN HF2847 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-19 - Secretary of State Chapter 149
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-19 - Secretary of State Chapter 149
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Cuyuna Country State Recreation Area Citizens Advisory Council modified.
Title
Cuyuna Country State Recreation Area Citizens Advisory Council modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Dale Lueck [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House: Passage (Y: 126 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House: Passage (Y: 126 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-19 | Secretary of State Chapter 149 | |
2018-05-19 | Governor's action Approval | |
2018-05-19 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2018-05-19 | Governor approval | |
2018-05-16 | Presented to Governor | |
2018-05-14 | House | Returned from Senate |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 64-1 |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Special Order: Rule 45 amendment stricken |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Second reading |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF2536 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF2536, now on General Orders |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Received from House |
2018-05-08 | House | Bill was passed vote: 126-0 |
2018-05-08 | House | Third reading |
2018-05-03 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Tuesday, May 08, 2018 |
2018-03-26 | House | Second reading |
2018-03-26 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2018-03-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Government Operations and Elections Policy |
2018-02-20 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF2536 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF2847