MN HF2830 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Becker County; county auditor-treasurer and recorder office combination process provided, and offices made appointive.
Title
Becker County; county auditor-treasurer and recorder office combination process provided, and offices made appointive.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-25 - House - House: Passage (Y: 90 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-29 | Senate | Second reading |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF2463 |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF2463, now on General Orders |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Received from House |
2014-04-25 | House | Bill was passed vote: 90-33 |
2014-04-25 | House | Third reading |
2014-04-25 | House | Amendments offered |
2014-04-23 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, April 25, 2014 |
2014-03-31 | House | Second reading |
2014-03-31 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2014-03-06 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Elections |