MN HF28 | 2020 | 91st Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on June 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-19 - Author added Fischer
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-19 - Author added Fischer
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Environment and natural resources funding provided, provisions modified relating to certifiable fish diseases; farmed Cervidae; reporting requirements; snowmobiles; watercraft safety; all-terrain vehicle definition; insecticide use; invasive species permits; state parks; special-use permits; regulations of possessing, propagating, and selling of snakes, lizards, and salamanders; hunting and fishing; Lake Superior Management Plan; Mississippi River Corridor Critical Area; wild rice; state property interests; Water Law; soil and water conservation fund; closed landfill investment fund; Advisory Council on Water Supply Systems and Wastewater Treatment Facilities; riparian protection; priority qualified facilities; food packaging; nonwoven disposable products; accounts; outdoor recreation units; additions and deletions to state parks and recreation areas; and state land sales; prior appropriations modified; rulemaking authorized; and money appropriated.
Title
Environment and natural resources funding provided, provisions modified relating to certifiable fish diseases; farmed Cervidae; reporting requirements; snowmobiles; watercraft safety; all-terrain vehicle definition; insecticide use; invasive species permits; state parks; special-use permits; regulations of possessing, propagating, and selling of snakes, lizards, and salamanders; hunting and fishing; Lake Superior Management Plan; Mississippi River Corridor Critical Area; wild rice; state property interests; Water Law; soil and water conservation fund; closed landfill investment fund; Advisory Council on Water Supply Systems and Wastewater Treatment Facilities; riparian protection; priority qualified facilities; food packaging; nonwoven disposable products; accounts; outdoor recreation units; additions and deletions to state parks and recreation areas; and state land sales; prior appropriations modified; rulemaking authorized; and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-19 | House | Author added Fischer |
2020-06-18 | House | Second reading |
2020-06-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2020-06-17 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2020-06-15 | House | Authors added Becker-Finn and Claflin |
2020-06-12 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division |