MN HF2799 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-12 - House: Author added Bly
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-12 - House: Author added Bly
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Food and nutrition assistance programs funding provided and money appropriated.
Title
Food and nutrition assistance programs funding provided and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. John Benson [D] | Rep. David Bly [D] | Rep. Karen Clark [D] | Rep. Jeremy Kalin [D] |
Rep. Linda Slocum [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | House: Author added Bly | |
2010-02-18 | House: Author added Slocum | |
2010-02-12 | House: Author added Clark | |
2010-02-09 | House: Referred by Chair to Housing Finance and Policy and Public Health Finance Division | |
2010-02-09 | House: Recalled by Chair | |
2010-02-08 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to Finance | |
2010-02-08 | House: Referred by Chair to Health Care and Human Services Finance Division |
Minnesota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/revisor/pages/search_status/status_detail.php?b=House&f=HF2799&ssn=0&y=2009 |
Text | http://wdoc.house.leg.state.mn.us/leg/LS86/HF2799.0.pdf |