MN HF2798 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-4)
Status: Passed on May 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-21 - Secretary of State Chapter 299
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-4)
Status: Passed on May 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-21 - Secretary of State Chapter 299
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Plants treated with pollinator lethal insecticide prohibited from being labeled or advertised as beneficial to pollinators.
Title
Plants treated with pollinator lethal insecticide prohibited from being labeled or advertised as beneficial to pollinators.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-16 - House - House: Repassage (Y: 111 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 118 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 118 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-21 | Secretary of State Chapter 299 | |
2014-05-21 | Governor's action Approval | |
2014-05-17 | Presented to Governor | |
2014-05-16 | House | Author added Falk |
2014-05-16 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by the Senate vote: 111-17 |
2014-05-16 | House | Third reading as amended by the Senate |
2014-05-16 | House | Motion prevailed |
2014-05-16 | House | Motion to concur with Senate amendments |
2014-05-16 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2014-05-16 | Senate | House concurred and repassed bill |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 60-0 |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Second reading |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF2695 |
2014-05-01 | House | Author added Hilstrom |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF2695, now on General Orders |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Received from House |
2014-04-30 | House | Author added Bly |
2014-04-29 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 118-10 |
2014-04-29 | House | Third reading as amended |
2014-04-29 | House | Amended |
2014-04-25 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Tuesday, April 29, 2014 |
2014-04-09 | House | Author added Ward, J.A. |
2014-04-03 | House | Author added Loeffler |
2014-03-26 | House | Authors added Newton and Fischer |
2014-03-20 | House | Authors added Fritz; Benson, J.; and Moran |
2014-03-20 | House | Second reading |
2014-03-20 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2014-03-12 | House | Author added Selcer |
2014-03-10 | House | Authors added McNamara; Poppe; Anderson, P.; Torkelson; Leidiger; Ward, J.E.; and Lillie |
2014-03-06 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Agriculture Policy |