MN HF2741 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Motion to return bill to author, motion prevailed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Motion to return bill to author, motion prevailed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans homeownership education and training provided.
Title
Veterans homeownership education and training provided.
Sponsors
Rep. Kaela Berg [D] | Rep. Dean Urdahl [R] | Rep. Mike Nelson [D] | Rep. Rena Moran [D] |
Rep. Athena Hollins [D] | Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] | Rep. Sandra Masin [D] | Rep. Rick Hansen [D] |
Rep. Carlos Mariani [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | House | Motion to return bill to author, motion prevailed |
2022-03-17 | House | Author added Mariani |
2022-03-14 | House | Author added Hansen, R. |
2022-03-10 | House | Author added Masin |
2022-03-03 | House | Author added Dettmer |
2022-02-28 | House | Author added Hollins |
2022-02-14 | House | Author added Moran |
2022-02-03 | House | Authors added Urdahl and Nelson, M. |
2022-01-31 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Housing Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2960 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Author added Duckworth