MN HF2739 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Wayzata; U.S. Highway 12 designated as Officer Bill Mathews Memorial Highway.
Title
Wayzata; U.S. Highway 12 designated as Officer Bill Mathews Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2018-04-23 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2018-04-19 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF 2484 |
2018-03-28 | House | Second reading |
2018-03-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2018-03-19 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2018-03-08 | House | Author added Youakim. |
2018-03-08 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Transportation Finance |
2018-02-20 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation and Regional Governance Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2484 (Similar To) 2018-05-08 - Secretary of State Chapter 108 05/03/18