MN HF2732 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Author added Nelson, N.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Author added Nelson, N.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public assistance and child care assistance program fraud prevention provided, theft offense penalties established, early learning scholarship eligibility modified, report required, and money appropriated.
Title
Public assistance and child care assistance program fraud prevention provided, theft offense penalties established, early learning scholarship eligibility modified, report required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | Author added Nelson, N. |
2019-04-01 | House | Author added West |
2019-03-28 | House | Author added Kresha |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-03-27 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |